THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 21:47:05 PM
Gunawardena, Dishani Thilakshini
CPSO#:
99566
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Mar 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5025 Yonge St
Suite 201
Toronto ON M2P 2S2
Phone: 647-846-3777
Fax: 647-846-3779
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Feb 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DISHANI THILAKSHINI GUNAWARDENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNAWARDENA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 24 Apr 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2014 |