skip to content

Bhayana, Dinesh

CPSO#: 92888

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Emergency Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: 4167473400 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bhayana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bhayana ( CPSO# 92888 )
Dr. A. Bhayana ( CPSO# 98189 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
Emergency Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DINESH BHAYANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAYANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013