skip to content

Bhayana, Anjali

CPSO#: 98189

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: Rastogi, Anjali (used until: 17 Nov 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehab Institute
Bickle Centre
130 Dunn Ave
Toronto ON  M6K 2R8
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bhayana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bhayana ( CPSO# 92888 )
Dr. A. Bhayana ( CPSO# 98189 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
Emergency Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANJALI BHAYANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAYANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2014