skip to content

Chan, Brian Alex

CPSO#: 99470

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Oct 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5995 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 5P7
Phone: 416-297-5330
Fax: 416-297-9727 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brian Alex Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chan ( CPSO# 99470 )

Business Address:
5995 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 5P7
Phone Number: (416) 297-5330

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Apr 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2015 Active
             Dr. Brian Alex Chan may practise medicine independently in family medicine.