skip to content

Chan, Brian Alex

CPSO#: 99470

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Oct 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5995 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 5P7
Phone: 416-297-5330
Fax: 416-297-9727 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brian Alex Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chan ( CPSO# 99470 )

Business Address:
5995 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 5P7
Phone Number: (416) 297-5330

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Apr 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2015 Active
             Dr. Brian Alex Chan may practise medicine independently in family medicine. 

The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.