THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:58:55 AM
Chan, Brian Alex
CPSO#:
99470
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
03 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5995 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1V 5P7
Phone: 416-297-5330
Fax: 416-297-9727
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Apr 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Sep 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Sep 2015 |
|
Active |