skip to content

Wimmer, Curt Juergen

CPSO#: 94455

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Oct 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1083 Ouellette
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8
Phone: (519) 915-7125
Fax: (519) 962-3339 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

194 Talbot Street W
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: 519-326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

22101 Morross
Detroit MI  48236
United States
Phone: 313-343-4000
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Curt Wimmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 24 2014
Corporation Name: Dr. Curt Wimmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Narewal ( CPSO# 81393 )
Dr. C. Wimmer ( CPSO# 94455 )

Business Address:
1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8

Business Address:
145 - 2475 McDougall Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:01 Oct 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018 Active
             Dr. Curt Juergen Wimmer may practice medicine independently in Emergency
            Medicine and Pain Medicine, only.