THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:07:10 AM
Wimmer, Curt J
CPSO#:
94455
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Wayne State University School of Medicin, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1083 Ouellette
Windsor ON N9A 4J8
Phone: (519) 915-7125
Fax: (519) 962-3339
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:01 Oct 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Oct 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 May 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2018 |
|
Active |