skip to content

Beckett, Andrew Neil

CPSO#: 93967

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
3-075 Donnelly Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416 864 5284 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Beckett Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lawless ( CPSO# 68749 )
Dr. N. Ahmed ( CPSO# 73094 )
Dr. A. Beckett ( CPSO# 93967 )
Dr. D. Gomez Jaramillo ( CPSO# 95829 )
Dr. J. de Rezende-Neto ( CPSO# 99828 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
3-073 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5481


Corporation Name: Andrew Beckett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Beckett ( CPSO# 93967 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW NEIL BECKETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2020