skip to content

Lawless, Bernard Wayne

CPSO#: 68749

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
3-Queen-078
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5481
Fax: (416) 864-3083 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B.W. Lawless Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lawless ( CPSO# 68749 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
3-Queen-073
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5481


Corporation Name: Beckett Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lawless ( CPSO# 68749 )
Dr. N. Ahmed ( CPSO# 73094 )
Dr. A. Beckett ( CPSO# 93967 )
Dr. D. Gomez Jaramillo ( CPSO# 95829 )
Dr. J. de Rezende-Neto ( CPSO# 99828 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
3-073 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5481

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:12 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BERNARD WAYNE LAWLESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWLESS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2001