skip to content

de Rezende-Neto, Joao Baptista

CPSO#: 99828

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Sep 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice as of 30 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Division of General Surgery
Donnelly Wing Room (Suite) 3-074
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5284
Fax: 416-864-5281 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Beckett Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lawless ( CPSO# 68749 )
Dr. N. Ahmed ( CPSO# 73094 )
Dr. A. Beckett ( CPSO# 93967 )
Dr. D. Gomez Jaramillo ( CPSO# 95829 )
Dr. J. de Rezende-Neto ( CPSO# 99828 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
3-073 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5481


Corporation Name: Joao B. de Rezende-Neto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. de Rezende-Neto ( CPSO# 99828 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Division of General Hospital
Suite 3-074, Donnelly Wing Room
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5284


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:19 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOAO BAPTISTA DE REZENDE-NETO may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. DE REZENDE-NETO holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. DE REZENDE-NETO may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. DE REZENDE-NETO no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. DE REZENDE-NETO no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. DE REZENDE-NETO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015