Balasuriya, Rajiv Dhananjaya (CPSO#: 96604)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Feb 2017

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5025 Yonge St
Suite 201
Toronto ON  M2N 5P2
Phone: 647-846-3777
Fax: 647-846-3779
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balasuriya & Gunawardena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gunawardena ( CPSO# 99566 )
Dr. R. Balasuriya ( CPSO# 96604 )

Business Address:
201 - 5025 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 5P2
Phone Number: (647) 846-3777

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 08 Feb 2018

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Balasuriya’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Balasuriya engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and engaged in conduct that was disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): May 13, 15-17, May 27-29, and August 27-29, 2019

Hearing Status: Adjourned

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
member Effective: 08 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 8, 2018, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Rajiv Dhananjaya
            Balasuriya, in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Balasuriya has
            given to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                  DR. DR. RAJIV DHANANJAYA BALASURIYA
                                          ("Dr. Balasuriya")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, certificate of registration number 96604, am a member
                  of the College. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, acknowledge that the College has referred to the
                  Discipline Committee, in the matter of College File Number 100497,
                  allegations that I engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient; and engaged
                  in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine
                  that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be
                  regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

            (4)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, have read the Notice of Hearing dated January 25,
                  2017, which sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the
                  College's concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature
                  of the allegations against me.




            B.    UNDERTAKING 

            (5)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective five days from the date this Undertaking is
                  signed, ("Effective Date"), and shall remain in effect until the matters
                  referred to discipline are disposed of by the Discipline Committee.

            (6)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, understand that, as of the Effective Date, this
                  undertaking replaces the undertaking I entered into dated February 24,
                  2017.

            (7)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, undertake that I shall not engage in any
                        professional encounters, in person or otherwise ("Professional
                        Encounter(s)"), with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction,
                        unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous
                        presence and under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a
                        regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the
                        "Practice Monitor(s)"), and unless the other requirements provided
                        in this Undertaking are fulfilled. For further clarity, I
                        understand that I must not be alone with any patient, for any
                        length of time, during any Professional Encounter, whether or not
                        the parent or guardian of the patient is also present.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and
                        understand what is required of the Practice Monitor including, but
                        not limited to:
                  
                        1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                              undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                        2.    remaining present at all times during all Professional
                              Encounters, in person or otherwise, with all patients; 
                  
                        3.    carefully observing all of my Professional Encounters with
                              patients, including but not limited to physical and internal
                              examinations. I further acknowledge my obligation to ensure
                              the Practice Monitor's view of all of my Professional
                              Encounters with patients, including physical and internal
                              examinations, is unobstructed at all times; 
                  
                        4.    refraining from performing any other functions, except those
                              required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as
                              Appendix "A", while observing me in all my Professional
                              Encounters with patients; 
                  
                        5.    maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with
                              patients in the form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix
                              "B" (the "Log") and in the manner described in Appendix "A";
                  
                        6.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                              patients noted in the Log; and
                  
                        7.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                              basis.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, undertake to maintain an up to date copy of the
                        Log by ensuring a copy is made at the end of each business day, and
                        to make it available to the College upon request. 
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited
                  to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of
                  executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (9)   Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, undertake that I shall post a sign in all
                        waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of my
                        Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in
                        the form set out in Appendix "C" that states: Dr. Balasuriya  must
                        not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with
                        patients, of any age, unless in the continuous presence and under
                        the continuous observation of a practice monitor acceptable to the
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Xxx must not be
                        alone during any professional encounter with any patient. Further
                        information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in
                        any language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described
                        in section (8)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                        consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "C."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, undertake to provide the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (8)(b), to the College within
                        thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, undertake that if I elect, after the execution
                        of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s),
                        I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, undertake to provide to the College the
                        certified translation(s) described in section (9)(b) prior to
                        beginning to provide services in the language(s) described in
                        section (9)(d).
                  
            (10)  Notifying Patients 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, undertake to ensure that each patient with whom
                        I have a Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the
                        Professional Encounter, of the details of the restriction described
                        in section (7)(a), above.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Balasuriya, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Balasuriya, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Balasuriya, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Balasuriya, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Balasuriya, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (16)  I, Dr. Balasuriya, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Balasuriya, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Balasuriya  engaged in professional misconduct. As a result
                              of the investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Balasuriya must not engage in any professional
                              encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age,
                              in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place
                              in the presence of a monitor who is a regulated health
                              professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other
                              requirements provided in Dr. Balasuriya's Undertaking with
                              the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr.
                              Balasuriya must not be alone with any patient during any
                              professional encounter.
                  
                              Dr. Balasuriya shall post a sign in all waiting rooms,
                              examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice
                              Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that
                              states: "Dr. Balasuriya  must not  have professional
                              encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age,
                              unless in the presence of a practice monitor acceptable to
                              the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr.
                              Balasuriya must not be alone with any patient during any
                              professional encounter. Further information may be found on
                              the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Balasuriya, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Balasuriya, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                  form, attached hereto as Appendix "D".

            (20)  I, Dr. Balasuriya, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my Practice Location(s) and to the inspection of patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Balasuriya, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to all Practice Monitors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (22)  I, Dr. Balasuriya, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (23)  I, Dr. Balasuriya, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: February 8, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Rajiv Dhananjaya Balasuriya to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 8, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Balasuriya engaged in professional misconduct. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Balasuriya must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Balasuriya’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Balasuriya must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Balasuriya shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Balasuriya must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Balasuriya must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.


Source: Member
Active Date: February 24, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Rajiv Dhananjaya Balasuriya to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 24, 2017:

Dr. Balasuriya is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient; and engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Balasuriya must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with female patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a female regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in his Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Balasuriya must not be alone with any female patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Balasuriya shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) and in each examination room and consulting room, in all his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Balasuriya must not have encounters with female patients, of any age, unless in the presence of a female practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Balasuriya must not be alone in any examination or consulting room with any female patient. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.