THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 17:57:26 PM
Balasuriya, Rajiv Dhananjaya
CPSO#:
96604
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 May 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5025 Yonge St
Suite 201
Toronto ON M2N 5P2
Phone: 647-846-3777
Fax: 647-846-3779
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJIV DHANANJAYA BALASURIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALASURIYA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 19 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Feb 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 24 Feb 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 08 Feb 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2019 |