skip to content

Abdel-Malik Ghali, Rafik Ramzy

CPSO#: 89356

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 205
477 King Street
Welland ON  L3B 3K4
Phone: (905) 732-6660
Fax: (905) 732-6669 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Ave St
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abdel-Malik Ghali ( CPSO# 89356 )

Business Address:
Unit 205
477 King Street
Welland ON  L3B 3K4
Phone Number: (905) 732-6660

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAFIK RAMZY ABDEL-MALIK GHALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-MALIK GHALI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 May 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 31 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 31 Jan 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2018