skip to content

Abdel-Malik Ghali, Rafik Ramzy

CPSO#: 89356

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 205
477 King Street
Welland ON  L3B 3K4
Phone: (905) 732-6660
Fax: (905) 732-6669 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Ave St
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
Phone: 9053784647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abdel-Malik Ghali ( CPSO# 89356 )

Business Address:
Unit 205
477 King Street
Welland ON  L3B 3K4
Phone Number: (905) 732-6660

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:19 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAFIK RAMZY ABDEL-MALIK GHALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-MALIK GHALI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 May 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 31 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 31 Jan 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2018