THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:56:02 AM
Abdel-Malik Ghali, Rafik Ramzy
CPSO#:
89356
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Oct 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
212-245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON L2S 1X8
Phone: (905) 732-6660
Fax: 905 984 8393
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:19 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAFIK RAMZY ABDEL-MALIK GHALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-MALIK GHALI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 30 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 31 Oct 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 07 Nov 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 31 Jan 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2018 |