skip to content

Thangaroopan, Arulnmozhy

CPSO#: 72646

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 953-7917
Fax: (905) 953-0046 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Thangaroopan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thangaroopan ( CPSO# 72646 )

Business Address:
602B - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 953-7917


Corporation Name: A.Y. Reginald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thangaroopan ( CPSO# 72646 )
Dr. A. Reginald ( CPSO# 92246 )

Business Address:
228 - 1333 Shepard Avenue East
York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 783-3375

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7789

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARULNMOZHY THANGAROOPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THANGAROOPAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 10 Mar 2003 to 06 Apr 2003
EL - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2004