skip to content

Reginald, Arunun Yohann

CPSO#: 92246

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Nov 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7789
Fax: (416) 813 7040 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 228-230
1333 Shepard Ave East
North York
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 783-3375
Fax: (416) 783-3376
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A.Y. Reginald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thangaroopan ( CPSO# 72646 )
Dr. A. Reginald ( CPSO# 92246 )

Business Address:
228 - 1333 Shepard Avenue East
York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 783-3375

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7789


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:15 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARUNUN YOHANN REGINALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REGINALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2009 to 26 Jan 2010
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 27 Jan 2010 to 03 Nov 2010
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012