skip to content

Sharma, Ajay Parkash

CPSO#: 78674

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice as of 24 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjabi University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital
Pediatrics, Nephrology
B1-161D
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500 Ext. 8354
Fax: 5196858156 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ajay Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sharma ( CPSO# 78674 )
Dr. M. Sharma ( CPSO# 90246 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8379

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:23 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AJAY PARKASH SHARMA may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. SHARMA holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. SHARMA may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SHARMA no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. SHARMA no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. SHARMA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
CF - Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Aug 2003 to 14 Aug 2004
CF - Paediatric Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Aug 2004 to 12 Dec 2004
CF - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2010