THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:42:39 PM
Sharma, Ajay Parkash
CPSO#:
78674
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
24 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Punjabi University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519 685 8354
Fax: 5196858156
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:23 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AJAY PARKASH SHARMA may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. SHARMA holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. SHARMA may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SHARMA no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. SHARMA no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. SHARMA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Aug 2003 to 14 Aug 2004
CF - Paediatric Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Aug 2004 to 12 Dec 2004
CF - Paediatric Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Feb 2010 |