skip to content

Lang, Anthony Edward Thomas

CPSO#: 28326

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jul 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1982

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
7 M C L
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5050
Fax: (416) 603-5004 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Lang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lang ( CPSO# 28326 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
7 MC-412
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5050

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 08 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANTHONY EDWARD THOMAS LANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Apr 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1982