THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 7:33:27 AM
Lang, Anthony Edward Thomas
CPSO#:
28326
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
7 M C L
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5050
Fax: (416) 603-5004
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:08 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY EDWARD THOMAS LANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Apr 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1982 |