THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:26:53 AM
Reginald, Arunun Yohann
CPSO#:
92246
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Nov 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7789
Fax: (416) 813 7040
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:15 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARUNUN YOHANN REGINALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REGINALD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2009 to 26 Jan 2010
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 27 Jan 2010 to 03 Nov 2010
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2012 |