skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/07/21 1:45:46 AM

Weetman, Sara Brooke

CPSO#: 90396

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8-900 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G5
Phone: 6476695684 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Weetman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Heese ( CPSO# 90073 )
Dr. S. Weetman ( CPSO# 90396 )

Business Address:
1 King St W
835 King St West, Kitchener, ON,N2G 1G3
Kitchener ON  N2G 1A1

Business Address:
7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARA BROOKE WEETMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEETMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2009