THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:03:27 AM
Weetman, Sara Brooke
CPSO#:
90396
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Apr 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Apr 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
A-83 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener ON N2G 1A7
Phone: 519-742-3611
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jun 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:19 Oct 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARA BROOKE WEETMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEETMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2009 |