skip to content

Heese, Theresa Annamarie

CPSO#: 90073

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Dec 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Weetman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Heese ( CPSO# 90073 )
Dr. S. Weetman ( CPSO# 90396 )

Business Address:
1 King St W
835 King St West, Kitchener, ON,N2G 1G3
Kitchener ON  N2G 1A1

Business Address:
7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2019

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 27, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)