THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 13:48:20 PM
Elkheir, Shiraz Yahia Mohamed
CPSO#:
98789
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Khartoum, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
110 Victoria Ave
La Verendrye General Hospital
Surgical Department
Fort Frances ON P9A 2B7
Phone: 807-274-3261 Ext. 4675
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) |
Hearst |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Lady Minto Hospital |
Cochrane |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHIRAZ YAHIA MOHAMED ELKHEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELKHEIR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - General Surgery
McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |