skip to content

Keffer, Lucas Micaiah

CPSO#: 111231

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 May 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 May 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nelson Medicine Professional
Corporation
301 Victoria Ave
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Phone: 8072743287 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Keffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nelson ( CPSO# 55513 )
Dr. L. Jenks ( CPSO# 55667 )
Dr. R. Nugent ( CPSO# 66632 )
Dr. K. Eltawil ( CPSO# 97650 )
Dr. M. Ruppenstein ( CPSO# 98445 )
Dr. S. Elkheir ( CPSO# 98789 )
Dr. M. Halvorsen ( CPSO# 100103)
Dr. V. Patel ( CPSO# 108275)
Dr. J. Burley ( CPSO# 109503)
Dr. C. Botsford ( CPSO# 109944)
Dr. L. Keffer ( CPSO# 111231)

Business Address:
301 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Phone Number: (807) 274-3287

Business Address:
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-3261

Business Address:
1460 Idylwild Drive
RMB 2004 RR#2
Fort Frances ON  P9A 3M3

Business Address:
310 Nelson Street
Fort Frances ON  P9A 1B1
Phone Number: (807) 274-7708

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:31 May 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUCAS MICAIAH KEFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEFFER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 02 Jan 2017 to 29 Jan 2017
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2018