THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:19:06 AM
Jarecki, Joanna
CPSO#:
94034
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2A-35 Upper Centennial Pky
Stoney Creek ON L8J 3W2
Phone: 9056628274
Fax: 9056623320
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOANNA JARECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARECKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2016 |