skip to content

DiValentino, Dennis Ryan

CPSO#: 92740

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Apr 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
685 Main St. E
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K4
Phone: (289) 396-2316
Fax: (289) 396-2532 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

205 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3T 2G8
Canada
Phone: (519) 758-5800
Fax: (519) 758-5801
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

90 Wellington St N
Hamilton ON  L8R1N1
Canada
Phone: 905-570-1000
Fax: 905-570-1001
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: DiValentino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. DiValentino ( CPSO# 92740 )

Business Address:
685 Main Street
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K4
Phone Number: (289) 396-2316

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 11 Apr 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 11 Apr 2019 Active
             As from April 11, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Dennis Ryan Di
            Valentino, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Di
            Valentino to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. DENNIS RYAN DI VALENTINO  
                                                ("Dr. Di Valentino")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                                (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Di Valentino, certificate of registration number 92740, am a
                  member of the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Di Valentino, acknowledge that the College conducted an
                  investigation bearing File Number 7215761 (the "Investigation") into
                  whether I, in my Family Medicine practice and also in my conduct, engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Di Valentino, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Di Valentino, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education  (the "Professional
                        Education") 
                  
                        (i)   ProBE Canada: (Professionalism/Problem Based Ethics)
                              Remediation.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Di Valentino, undertake to provide proof to the College of
                        my successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Di Valentino, undertake to complete this requirement by
                        September 30, 2019 or, if the Professional Education program is not
                        available by that time, by the first possible opportunity
                        thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Di Valentino, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (6)   I, Dr. Di Valentino, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (7)   I, Dr. Di Valentino, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (8)   I, Dr. Di Valentino, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (9)   I, Dr. Di Valentino, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (10)  I, Dr. Di Valentino, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 


            (11)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Di Valentino, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Di Valentino, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (11)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Di Valentino
                        engaged in professional misconduct. As a result of the
                        investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Di Valentino will engage in professional education by
                              completing ProBE Canada: (Professionalism/Problem Based
                              Ethics) Remediation.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Di Valentino, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in
                        effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Di Valentino, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide the following information to any person who requires this
                  information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the
                  Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Di Valentino, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led
                  to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Di Valentino, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs
                  of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the
                  following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (c)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: April 11, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dennis Ryan Di Valentino to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 11, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Di Valentino engaged in professional misconduct. As a result of the investigation:

- Dr. Di Valentino will engage in professional education by completing ProBE Canada: (Professionalism/Problem Based Ethics) Remediation.