THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 19:31:18 PM
van Diepen, Kelly Marie
CPSO#:
90651
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:19 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KELLY MARIE VAN DIEPEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DIEPEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 05 May 2013 to 04 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 05 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 May 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |