skip to content

van Diepen, Kelly Marie

CPSO#: 90651

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

10-180 Queen St W
Health Canada
PSOP
Toronto ON  M5V 3L7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kelly van Diepen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. van Diepen ( CPSO# 90651 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Science
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
690 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective:13 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KELLY MARIE VAN DIEPEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DIEPEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 05 May 2013 to 04 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 05 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015