THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 8:07:45 AM
Suryavanshi, Shveta
CPSO#:
87912
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Dec 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Dec 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Gorakhpur University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Docudavit Solutions
Fax: 18662979338
Phone: 18887819083
Date Received: 16 Mar 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHVETA SURYAVANSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURYAVANSHI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2007 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: August 11, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)