skip to content

Suryavanshi, Rajeev Kumar

CPSO#: 87860

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Nov 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Gorakhpur University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite A Upper
568 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W6
Phone: (519) 336-1800
Fax: (519) 336-1801 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Blue Water Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: (519) 464-4500
Fax: 519 464-4407
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Suryavanshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Suryavanshi ( CPSO# 87912 )
Dr. R. Suryavanshi ( CPSO# 87860 )

Business Address:
Upper Suite A
568 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W6
Phone Number: (519) 336-1800


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAJEEV KUMAR SURYAVANSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURYAVANSHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2007
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.