THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 0:54:07 AM
Guzman, Juan Camilo
CPSO#:
82169
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Industrial De Santander, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Medicine
Syncope and Cardiovascular Autonomi
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 44368
Fax: 905-577-8013
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUAN CAMILO GUZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUZMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2005 to 15 Apr 2005
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 16 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2012 |