skip to content

Guzman, Juan Camilo

CPSO#: 82169

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education: Universidad Industrial De Santander, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Medicine
Syncope and Cardiovascular Autonomi
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 44368
Fax: 905-577-8013 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Syncope and Cardiovascular Autonomi
Arrhythmia Service
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 44368
Fax: 9055778037
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Guzman Orduz & Monroy Rodriguez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Guzman ( CPSO# 82169 )
Dr. F. Monroy Rodriguez ( CPSO# 88865 )

Business Address:
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:11 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUAN CAMILO GUZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUZMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Feb 2005 to 15 Apr 2005
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 16 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012