THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:49:30 AM
Shyam, Vidur
CPSO#:
81241
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Hindi
Education: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 JOHN MARKS AVENUE
Kingston ON K7K 0J7
Phone: (613) 507 7246
Fax: (613) 344 1203
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:15 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIDUR SHYAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHYAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 06 Aug 2004
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 07 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Apr 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2009 |