skip to content

Shyam, Vidur

CPSO#: 81241

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hindi

Education:L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 JOHN MARKS AVENUE
Kingston ON  K7K 0J7
Phone: (613) 507 7246
Fax: (613) 344 1203 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166, Brock street
Kingston ON  K7L5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3410
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

KINGSTON HEALTH SCIENCE CENTRE
DEPT. OF ANESTHESIOLOGY
76 STUART STREET
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 548 7827
Fax: (613) 548 1375
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vidur Shyam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesiology
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827


Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 2 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIDUR SHYAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHYAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 06 Aug 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 07 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Apr 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009