THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:29:11 AM
Coret-Simon, Judit
CPSO#:
79858
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hebrew, Hungarian
Education: Institute Medicine,Pharmacy,Tirgu-Mures, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
St Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34192
Fax: (905) 540-6590
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jul 2005 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 19 Sep 2003
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Apr 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Mar 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Mar 2015 |
|
Active |