skip to content

Coret-Simon, Judit

CPSO#: 79858

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2005
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Hungarian

Education:Institute Medicine,Pharmacy,Tirgu-Mures, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
St Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34192
Fax: (905) 540-6590 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Judith Coret-Simon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )

Business Address:
Department of Radiology
St Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155


Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )
Dr. G. So ( CPSO# 76100 )
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )
Dr. C. Boylan ( CPSO# 78775 )
Dr. N. Muhn ( CPSO# 79555 )
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )
Dr. V. Leung ( CPSO# 93077 )
Dr. A. Alabousi ( CPSO# 95414 )
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )
Dr. O. Mironov ( CPSO# 107610)

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
G2 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
104- 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 389-0300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 19 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2015 Active
             Dr. Judit Coret-Simon may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology.