THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 22:38:09 PM
King, Kebby Fame Geneeth
CPSO#:
78979
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 May 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Care
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 7432121 Ext. 5188
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEBBY FAME GENEETH KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 May 2003 to 04 Jul 2003
PEAP - R - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 May 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2009 |