skip to content

King, Kebby Fame Geneeth

CPSO#: 78979

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 May 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Care
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 7432121 Ext. 5188 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Canada
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Aldis ( CPSO# 31600 )
Dr. D. Bourgeois ( CPSO# 54466 )
Dr. K. Millitz ( CPSO# 63758 )
Dr. R. Sobiera ( CPSO# 65094 )
Dr. W. Myint ( CPSO# 67814 )
Dr. M. Voros ( CPSO# 73634 )
Dr. P. Wilson ( CPSO# 74749 )
Dr. K. King ( CPSO# 78979 )
Dr. S. Harvie ( CPSO# 87296 )
Dr. B. Junqueira-Duarte ( CPSO# 93836 )
Dr. S. Zaheer ( CPSO# 95170 )
Dr. F. Abdelsayed ( CPSO# 100533)

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
Diagnostic Imaging Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5039

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-3111


Corporation Name: Dr. Kebby King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. King ( CPSO# 78979 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEBBY FAME GENEETH KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 May 2003 to 04 Jul 2003
PEAP - R - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 05 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009