THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:37:26 PM
Grosser, Elana
CPSO#:
78031
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6479
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELANA GROSSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2006 |