THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:03:54 PM
Shenfield, Leisa Jayne
CPSO#:
64950
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hillier, Leisa Jayne (used until: 06 Jul 2009 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles St
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-3847
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEISA JAYNE SHENFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENFIELD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jul 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2009 |