THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:24:33 PM
Kay, John David
CPSO#:
60917
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
190 Wortley Road
Suite 209
London ON N6C 4Y7
Phone: (519) 667-2221
Fax: (519) 667-2001
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site |
Petrolia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:21 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID KAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1990 |