skip to content

Gerrie, Alexandra Jean

CPSO#: 62427

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
209-190 Wortley Rd
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone: 5196672221
Fax: 5196672001 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gerrie Kay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kay ( CPSO# 60917 )
Dr. A. Gerrie ( CPSO# 62427 )

Business Address:
Core Family Health
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 963-1875

Business Address:
209 - 190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone Number: (519) 667-2221

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA JEAN GERRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERRIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991