THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 18:40:01 PM
Gaytan-Garcia Graham, Silvia Raquel Margarita
CPSO#:
60547
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Feb 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Feb 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neuropathology |
Effective:07 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:29 May 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SILVIA RAQUEL MARGARITA GAYTAN-GARCIA GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAYTAN-GARCIA GRAHAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Jul 1992
Resident 4 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Neuropathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 1999 |