skip to content

Gaytan-Garcia Graham, Silvia Raquel Margarita

CPSO#: 60547

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Feb 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 1999

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4779
Fax: (705) 675-4780 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Queen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 51679 )
Dr. M. Queen ( CPSO# 51719 )
Dr. S. Gaytan-Garcia Graham ( CPSO# 60547 )
Dr. A. Tomczak-Bojarski ( CPSO# 73304 )
Dr. B. Mitrovic ( CPSO# 91572 )
Dr. B. Danielson ( CPSO# 93246 )
Dr. M. Ngae ( CPSO# 94283 )
Dr. R. McClure ( CPSO# 101763)
Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon ( CPSO# 102034)

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100


Corporation Name: Dr. Silvia Gaytan-Garcia Graham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gaytan-Garcia Graham ( CPSO# 60547 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 07 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 29 May 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SILVIA RAQUEL MARGARITA GAYTAN-GARCIA GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAYTAN-GARCIA GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Jul 1992
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1999