THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 22:24:36 PM
Jabouin, Serge
CPSO#:
52471
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Oct 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Feb 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Creole, English, French
Education: University of Haiti, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
336 Donald St
Ottawa ON K1K 1M5
Phone: (613) 563-2121
Fax: (613)563-1331
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SERGE JABOUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABOUIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 1985 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Aug 1994
Summary:
In August 1994, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Jabouin guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 29(33) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Jabouin be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months. This suspension was itself to be suspended, however, provided that the Doctor agreed to undertake a gender sensitivity counselling program. The Committee also ordered that periodic reports be made to the Registrar, on a frequency to be agreed upon between the Registrar and the treating physician.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1996-06-05
Hearing Date(s): Aug 22, 1994