THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:22:59 AM
Bourque, Pierre Raymond Joseph
CPSO#:
33489
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Sep 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Sep 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Division of Neurology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4777
Fax: (613) 761-5403
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:25 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PIERRE RAYMOND JOSEPH BOURQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURQUE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1989 |